Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Marcia Lindahl, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Blake Lindahl, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Rocky J. Baio presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 17, 2013 |
CategoryDv Req Orders |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time480 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 34 DUE TO JUDICIAL REASSIGNMENT | |
November 08, 2013 | Docket Event | RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING (CLETS) FILED. RESTRAINING ORDER EXPIRES 11/07/16 | |
November 08, 2013 | Docket Event | HEARING ON RESTRAINING ORDER REQUESTED BY MARCIA LINDAHL | |
November 08, 2013 | Docket Event | CONSENT FOR COURT ASSIGNMENT TO COMMISSIONER ROCKY J. BAIO FILED | |
October 23, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF DV REQ ORDERS OF LINDAHL SERVED ON BLAKE LINDAHL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/21/13 FILED | |
October 22, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF DV REQ ORDERS OF LINDAHL SERVED ON BLAKE LINDAHL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/21/13 FILED | |
October 18, 2013 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER FILED | |
October 18, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT HEARING (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE) FILED BY MARCIA LINDAHL | |
October 17, 2013 | Docket Event | CONSENT FOR COURT ASSIGNMENT TO COMMISSIONER ROCKY J. BAIO FILED BY MARCIA LINDAHL | |
October 17, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: EX PARTE NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY MARCIA LINDAHL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.