Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Laura Bensel, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lawrence Bensel, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management180 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 16, 2013 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions118 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time217 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event | MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 05/01/14 | |
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event | CORRECTED JUDGMENT AND CORRECTED NTC OF ENTRY OF JMNT FILED BY LAURA BENSEL | |
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION (FAMILY CODE 2336) FILED | |
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTERED AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
January 31, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY LAURA BENSEL | |
January 31, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY LAWRENCE BENSEL | |
January 31, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON PETITION OF BENSEL AS TO LAWRENCE BENSEL | |
January 31, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED | |
November 07, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF SUMMONS AND PETITION SERVED ON LAWRENCE BENSEL; DATE OF MAILING 10/25/13 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.