Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jose Olmer Nolasco, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ana Bonilla, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with JoAnn Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management188 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 01, 2013 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions440 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time440 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2015 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION (FAMILY CODE 2336) FILED | |
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event | MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 12/05/14 | |
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTERED AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY JOSE OLMER NOLASCO | |
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ANA BONILLA | |
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON PETITION OF NOLASCO AS TO ANA BONILLA | |
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED BY JOSE OLMER NOLASCO, ANA BONILLA | |
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.