Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Fabiana Gamez, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Kenia Portillo, Luis Fernando Gamez, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management188 days |
Filing DateOctober 01, 2013 |
CategoryPetition |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2039 | Docket Event | ** DO NOT FILE IN CASE - DISMISSED 12/05/17 ** | |
December 05, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROCEED PURSUANT TO CCP 583.210 | |
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
April 14, 2015 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDERS - CHILD VISITATION FILED BY FABIANA GAMEZ FILED ON 10/01/13 | |
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event | MEDIATION SET IN VENTURA | |
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND FAMILY LAW STATUS CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.