Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of San Diego filed a(n) Statement case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2013 |
CategoryStatement |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time1514 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE REGARDING PAYMENT OF SUPPORT (LOCAL CHILD SUPPORT AGENCY NO LONGER PROVIDING SERVICES) FILED | |
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE REGARDING PAYMENT OF SUPPORT SERVED PER SERVICE LIST. DATE OF MAILING: 09/22/17 | |
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 34 DUE TO JUDICIAL REASSIGNMENT | |
October 07, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ORDER AFTER HEARING SERVED ON MICHAEL TAYLOR, SHANNON FOSCO (NON-PARTY) FILED. DATE OF MAILING: 10/07/13 | |
September 27, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED | |
September 26, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT FILED BY COUNTY OF VENTURA FILED ON 08/08/13 | |
August 23, 2013 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY MICHAEL LEE TAYLOR | |
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE TO APPEAR AND PRODUCE SERVED ON MICHAEL LEE TAYLOR FILED. DATE OF MAILING 08/08/13 | |
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT FILED BY COUNTY OF VENTURA FILED ON 08/08/13 | |
August 05, 2013 | Docket Event | DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES # 20000000430083 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.