Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Peter M Avisov, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Elena Ellen Avisov, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with JoAnn Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management181 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2013 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions519 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2039 | Docket Event | MEDIATOR: ANNIE STEPHENS ON 04/16/14 | |
December 31, 2039 | Docket Event | MEDIATOR: ANNIE STEPHENS ON 1/9/15 | |
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE REGARDING PAYMENT OF SUPPORT (LOCAL CHILD SUPPORT AGENCY NO LONGER PROVIDING SERVICES) FILED | |
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE REGARDING PAYMENT OF SUPPORT SERVED ON PETER AVISOV, ELENA SIECK & ATTY (NON-PARTY) FILED. DATE OF MAILING: 08/31/16 | |
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ORDER AFTER HEARING SERVED ON PETER M AVISOV & ELENA SIECK (NON-PARTY) FILED. DATE OF MAILING: 06/27/16 | |
June 09, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED | |
June 07, 2016 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY PETER M AVISOV | |
June 07, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT FILED BY COUNTY OF VENTURA FILED ON 04/28/16 | |
June 07, 2016 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO GOVERNMENTAL NOTICE OF MOTION/OSC FILED BY PETER M AVISOV, REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER. | |
June 01, 2016 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ELENA ELLEN AVISOV |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.