Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lisa Mehl, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Brett Mehl, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions263 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time439 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FOR LISA MEHL FILED | |
September 17, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION (FAMILY CODE 2336) FILED | |
September 17, 2013 | Docket Event | MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 09/10/13 | |
September 17, 2013 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTERED AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
September 03, 2013 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE, STIPULATIONS AND WAIVERS FILED BY LISA MEHL, A MEMBER OF THE MILITARY, WAIVING ALL RIGHTS UNDER THE SERVICEMEMBERS CIVIL RELIEF ACT OF 2003 FILED | |
September 03, 2013 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED | |
August 13, 2013 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER RE MARITAL RESIDENCE FILED | |
August 05, 2013 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY BRETT MEHL | |
August 05, 2013 | Docket Event | FEE PAID BY BRETT MEHL (RESPONSE OR OTHER FIRST PAPER FILED IN RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE OR DOMESTIC PARTNERSHIP, LEGAL SEPARATION OR NULLITY) | |
August 05, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY & FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY BRETT MEHL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.