Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Annjanette Garcia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Daniel Morales, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with JoAnn Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoAnn Johnson Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 11, 2002 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions68 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time3509 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event | HEARING ON RETURN ON BENCH WARRANT FOR DANIEL MORALES, BWI 02/01/19 | |
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE REGARDING PAYMENT OF SUPPORT (LOCAL CHILD SUPPORT AGENCY NO LONGER PROVIDING SERVICES) FILED | |
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE REGARDING PAYMENT OF SUPPORT SERVED PER SERVICE LIST FILED - DATE OF MAILING: 06/29/20 | |
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR - DANIEL MORALES | |
November 08, 2018 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF APPLICATION & ORDER FOR APPEARANCE & EXAMINATION SERVED ON DANIEL MORALES WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/06/18 FILED | |
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event | APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR DANIEL MORALES FILED BY COUNTY OF VENTURA | |
October 19, 2018 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR - DANIEL MORALES | |
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event | APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR DANIEL MORALES FILED BY COUNTY OF VENTURA | |
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF STIPULATION AND ORDER SERVED ON ANNJANETTE GARCIA, DANIEL MORALES FILED. DATE OF MAILING 04/14/14 | |
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CHILD SUPPORT FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.