Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Janette Banks, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Michael G Banks, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 28, 2009 |
CategoryPetition |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2039 | Docket Event | MEDIATOR: RACHEL CURTIS ON 11/17/09 | |
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event | SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AT TIME OF MSC FILED | |
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CONTEMPT AGAINST MICHAEL G BANKS FILED BY JANETTE BANKS | |
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event | MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | |
June 21, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY JANETTE BANKS | |
June 07, 2010 | Docket Event | MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | |
May 26, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CONTEMPT AGAINST MICHAEL G BANKS FILED BY JANETTE BANKS | |
April 19, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF PETITIONER'S STATEM OF AGREEMENT & DISAGREEMENT SERVED ON MICHAEL G BANKS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/12/10 FILED | |
April 19, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF OSC RE CONTEMPT FILED 04/12/10 SERVED ON MICHAEL G BANKS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/12/10 FILED | |
April 12, 2010 | Docket Event | FEE PAID BY JANETTE BANKS (MOTION OR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN A FAMILY LAW MATTER) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.