Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Kristopher Davis, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Scottie Davis, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with James Brown presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 2003 |
CategoryPetition |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2039 | Docket Event | MEDIATOR: AMY SMITH ON 08/04/09 | |
December 31, 2039 | Docket Event | MEDIATOR: AMY SMITH ON 07/23/14 | |
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE REGARDING PAYMENT OF SUPPORT (LOCAL CHILD SUPPORT AGENCY NO LONGER PROVIDING SERVICES) FILED | |
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE REGARDING PAYMENT OF SUPPORT SERVED ON KRISTOPHER DAVIS, SCOTTIE DAVIS FILED. DATE OF MAILING 08/21/17 | |
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ORDER AFTER HEARING SERVED ON KRISTOPHER DAVIS, SCOTTIE DAVIS FILED. DATE OF MAILING 04/17/17 | |
April 13, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED | |
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT FILED BY COUNTY OF VENTURA FILED ON 03/03/17 | |
March 03, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT FILED BY COUNTY OF VENTURA FILED ON 03/03/17 | |
March 03, 2017 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE TO APPEAR AND PRODUCE SERVED ON KRIS J DAVIS, DONNA C SANTO (NON-PARTY) FILED. DATE OF MAILING: 03/03/17 | |
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF STIPULATION AND ORDER SERVED ON KRISTOPHER DAVIS, SCOTTIE DAVIS FILED. DATE OF MAILING 06/17/15 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.