Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cynthia Hampton, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Christopher Flores, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2009 |
CategoryPetition |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time549 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2010 | Docket Event | **DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE, CASE DISMISSED 6/25/10** | |
June 25, 2010 | Docket Event | COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT | |
March 03, 2010 | Docket Event | FURTHER CASE REVIEW CONFERENCE RE: DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT | |
January 04, 2010 | Docket Event | FURTHER CASE REVIEW CONFERENCE RE: DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT | |
October 28, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE REVIEW CONFERENCE RE DEFAULT/RESPONSE | |
September 04, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE REVIEW CONFERENCE RE PROOF OF SERVICE | |
July 13, 2009 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR SERVICE OF POSTING FILED; PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND PETITION OF HAMPTON AS TO CHRISTOPHER FLORES FILED SHOWING SERVICE BY POSTING AND MALING. DATE OF POSTING AND MAILING: 07/13/09 | |
July 13, 2009 | Docket Event | JURISDICTION DATE: 07/13/09 | |
June 30, 2009 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY CYNTHIA HAMPTON | |
June 30, 2009 | Docket Event | WIFE'S FORMER NAME: NOT REQUESTED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.