Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of Ventura, filed a(n) Complaint case against Noreen C Phelps, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2009 |
CategoryComplaint |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time2050 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 34 DUE TO JUDICIAL REASSIGNMENT | |
October 23, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NTC RE PAYMENT OF SUPPORT SERVED ON NOREEN C PHELPS FILED. DATE OF MAILING 10/23/13 | |
October 23, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE REGARDING PAYMENT OF SUPPORT (LOCAL CHILD SUPPORT AGENCY NO LONGER PROVIDING SERVICES) FILED | |
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 36 DUE TO JUDICIAL REASSIGNMENT | |
September 15, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO NOREEN C PHELPS | |
September 15, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO RICHARD E MCMURTRY | |
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ESTABLISHING PARENTAL RELATIONSHIP AND CHILD SUPPORT FILED | |
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED | |
September 08, 2009 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF COUNTY OF VENTURA AS TO NOREEN C PHELPS. | |
August 17, 2009 | Docket Event | JURISDICTION DATE: 07/20/09 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.