Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of Ventura, filed a(n) Complaint case against Luis Miguel Ceballos, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2009 |
CategoryComplaint |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time2050 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 34 DUE TO JUDICIAL REASSIGNMENT | |
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 36 DUE TO JUDICIAL REASSIGNMENT | |
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY COUNTY OF VENTURA. | |
November 04, 2009 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED | |
June 30, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 34 (FAMILY LAW) | |
June 30, 2009 | Docket Event | DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED | |
June 30, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY - ORIGINAL RETAINED IN COURT FILE | |
June 30, 2009 | Docket Event | DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES # 200000000168540 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.