Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of Ventura, filed a(n) Complaint case against Ricardo Tapia Madrigal, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2009 |
CategoryComplaint |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time2050 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 34 DUE TO JUDICIAL REASSIGNMENT | |
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 36 DUE TO JUDICIAL REASSIGNMENT | |
February 01, 2011 | Docket Event | DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES # 200000000480589 | |
February 01, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE RE PAYMENT OF SUPPORT SERVED ON RICARDO TAPIA MADRIGAL FILED. DATE OF MAILING 02/01/11 | |
February 01, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE REGARDING PAYMENT OF SUPPORT (SUBSTITUTION OF PAYEE) FILED | |
February 01, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE RE PAYMENT OF SUPPORT SERVED ON DIANA CASTILLO FILED. DATE OF MAILING 02/01/11 | |
September 28, 2009 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF STIP FOR JUDGMENT, NTC OF RIGHTS AND RESPONSIBILIT SERVED ON DIANA CASTILLO FILED. DATE OF MAILING 09/28/09 | |
September 28, 2009 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF STIP FOR JGMNT, NTC OF RIGHTS AND RESPONSIBILITIES SERVED ON RICARDO TAPIA MADRIGAL FILED. DATE OF MAILING 09/28/09 | |
September 02, 2009 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT FILED | |
July 29, 2009 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF COUNTY OF VENTURA SERVED ON RICARDO TAPIA MADRIGAL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/20/09 FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.