Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
County Of Ventura, filed a(n) Complaint case against Gerardo Rodriguez, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryComplaint |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions111 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2039 | Docket Event | * * DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE - CONSOLIDATED INTO D331027 * * | |
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 34 DUE TO JUDICIAL REASSIGNMENT | |
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 36 DUE TO JUDICIAL REASSIGNMENT | |
September 15, 2010 | Docket Event | THIS CASE # D331270 WAS ORDERED CONSOLIDATED INTO CASE # D331027 ON 08/16/10 | |
August 16, 2010 | Docket Event | HEARING *ON FOR REFERENCE* WITH CASE NUMBER D331027 | |
May 13, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ORDER AFTER HEARING SERVED ON GERARDO RODRIGUEZ FILED. DATE OF MAILING 05/13/10 | |
May 13, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ORDER AFTER HEARING SERVED ON ALEXANDRIA M VILLEGAS FILED. DATE OF MAILING 05/13/10 | |
May 11, 2010 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT FILED BY COUNTY OF VENTURA FILED ON 04/12/10 | |
May 11, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED | |
April 12, 2010 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT FILED BY COUNTY OF VENTURA FILED ON 04/12/10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.