Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of Ventura, filed a(n) Complaint case against Esteban Saldivar, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryComplaint |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time2231 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 34 DUE TO JUDICIAL REASSIGNMENT | |
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 36 DUE TO JUDICIAL REASSIGNMENT | |
May 21, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ESTEBAN SALDIVAR | |
May 21, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO BERENICE MANZO | |
May 19, 2009 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ESTABLISHING PARENTAL RELATIONSHIP AND CHILD SUPPORT FILED | |
May 19, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED | |
May 12, 2009 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF COUNTY OF VENTURA AS TO ESTEBAN SALDIVAR. | |
April 09, 2009 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF COUNTY OF VENTURA AS TO ESTEBAN SALDIVAR, BY SUB-SERVING ALMALIA SEGURA, CO OCCUPANT/MOTHER. MAILING DATE OF 01/24/09. | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY - ORIGINAL RETAINED IN COURT FILE | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 34 (FAMILY LAW) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.