Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of Ventura, filed a(n) Complaint case against Jose Bautista, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryComplaint |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time2644 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE REGARDING PAYMENT OF SUPPORT (LOCAL CHILD SUPPORT AGENCY NO LONGER PROVIDING SERVICES) FILED | |
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE REGARDING PAYMENT OF SUPPORT SERVED ON JOSE BAUTISTA, MARIA L BAUTISTA FILED. DATE OF MAILING 03/28/16 | |
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 34 DUE TO JUDICIAL REASSIGNMENT | |
November 04, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF STIPULATION AND ORDER SERVED ON JOSE BAUTISTA, MARIA L BAUTISTA FILED. DATE OF MAILING 11/04/13 | |
September 19, 2013 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CHILD SUPPORT FILED | |
September 17, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT FILED BY COUNTY OF VENTURA FILED ON 07/23/13 | |
July 23, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT FILED BY COUNTY OF VENTURA FILED ON 07/23/13 | |
July 23, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE TO APPEAR AND PRODUCE SERVED ON JOSE BAUTISTA FILED. DATE OF MAILING 07/23/13 | |
July 19, 2013 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR JOSE BAUTISTA | |
June 21, 2013 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR JOSE BAUTISTA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.