Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Andrea Marmolejo, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Cruz Rangel, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 14, 1994 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions296 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time306 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2009 | Docket Event | FURTHER CASE REVIEW CONFERENCE RE: STATUS OF JUDGMENT | |
March 20, 2009 | Docket Event | MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 03/30/09 | |
March 20, 2009 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTERED AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
March 20, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION (FAMILY CODE 2336) FILED | |
January 12, 2009 | Docket Event | FURTHER CASE REVIEW CONFERENCE RE: FILING OF THE DEFAULT AND/OR JUDGMENT | |
January 12, 2009 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED BY ANDREA MARMOLEJO | |
January 12, 2009 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON PETITION OF MARMOLEJO AS TO CRUZ RANGEL. | |
January 02, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ANDREA MARMOLEJO | |
December 08, 2008 | Docket Event | FURTHER CASE REVIEW CONFERENCE RE: FILING OF THE PROOF OF SERVICE | |
October 22, 2008 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND PETITION OF MARMOLEJO SERVED ON CRUZ RANGEL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/29/08 FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.