Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Marolyn Crystal Bautista-Sim, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Epifanio Pablo-Bautista, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions301 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time301 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2008 | Docket Event | FURTHER CASE REVIEW CONFERENCE RE: RESUBMISSION OF JUDGMENT | |
October 27, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION (FAMILY CODE 2336) FILED | |
October 27, 2008 | Docket Event | (FL) REQUEST FOR DEFAULT/UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT | |
October 27, 2008 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTERED AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
October 27, 2008 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO APPOINT SUSAN RATZKIN AS JUDGE PRO TEM SIGNED AND FILED | |
October 27, 2008 | Docket Event | MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 12/09/08 | |
October 27, 2008 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED BY MAROLYN CRYSTAL BAUTISTA-SIM | |
October 07, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY MAROLYN CRYSTAL BAUTISTA-SIM | |
September 22, 2008 | Docket Event | FURTHER CASE REVIEW CONFERENCE RE: STATUS OF THE JUDGMENT | |
July 28, 2008 | Docket Event | FURTHER CASE REVIEW CONFERENCE RE: FILING OF THE JUDGMENT. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.