Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Daniel R. Ramirez, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Andrea J. Ramirez, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Bruce A. Young presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBruce A. Young Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 21, 2002 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions341 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2039 | Docket Event | MEDIATOR: VICTORIA TERRILL ON 11/02/15 | |
December 31, 2039 | Docket Event | MEDIATOR: VINCE MORDA ON 06/07/06 | |
December 31, 2039 | Docket Event | MEDIATOR: SUSAN KASSER ON 07/31/09 | |
December 31, 2039 | Docket Event | MEDIATOR: SUSAN KASSER ON 06/25/12 | |
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR - DANIEL R. RAMIREZ | |
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD (CCP SECTION 285.1) FILED - FORMER ATTORNEY CARLA L. HARTLEY REMOVED AS TO ANDREA J. RAMIREZ AND REPLACED BY PRO/PER | |
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR - DANIEL R. RAMIREZ | |
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LODINGS OF SEALED RECORDS FILED BY ANDREA J. RAMIREZ | |
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF APPL & ORDER FOR APPEARANCE & EXAMINATION SERVED ON DANIEL R. RAMIREZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/30/19 FILED | |
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event | APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR DANIEL R. RAMIREZ FILED BY COUNTY OF VENTURA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.