Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Tina Kennedy, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Sean Kennedy, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 29, 2005 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions12420 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2039 | Docket Event | ** CASE DISMISSED 04/21/06 ** | |
April 28, 2006 | Docket Event | (FL) CASE REVIEW CONFERENCE | |
April 21, 2006 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED | |
January 13, 2006 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND PETITION OF KENNEDY SERVED ON SEAN KENNEDY WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/12/06 | |
January 13, 2006 | Docket Event | JURISDICTION DATE: 01/12/06 | |
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY - ORIGINAL RETAINED IN COURT FILE | |
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event | FEE WAIVER EXPIRES: 06/29/06 FOR TINA KENNEDY | |
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER ON APPLICATION TO WAIVE FEES FILED BY TINA KENNEDY GRANTED IN PART IN THE AMOUNT OF $300.00 | |
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY TINA KENNEDY | |
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: COURT ASSIGNMENT (FAMILY LAW) FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.