Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Teresa Del Fierro, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Pedro Del Fierro, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Bruce A. Young presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 01, 2005 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions91 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time211 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2006 | Docket Event | (FL) CASE REVIEW CONFERENCE | |
April 03, 2006 | Docket Event | (FL) CASE REVIEW CONFERENCE | |
March 02, 2006 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION (FAMILY CODE 2336) FILED | |
March 02, 2006 | Docket Event | MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 06/29/06 | |
March 02, 2006 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTERED AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
March 01, 2006 | Docket Event | HEARING SET ON 04/03/06 AT 8:45 IN COURTROOM 22F IS VACATED. REASON: TO BE RESET: JUDGMT SUBMITTED | |
February 15, 2006 | Docket Event | JURISDICTION DATE: 12/28/05 | |
February 15, 2006 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND PETITION OF DEL FIERRO SERVED ON PEDRO DEL FIERRO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/28/05 | |
February 15, 2006 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON PETITION OF DEL FIERRO AS TO PEDRO DEL FIERRO. | |
February 15, 2006 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY & WAIVER OF SERVICE OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY TERESA DEL FIERRO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.