Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of Ventura, filed a(n) Complaint case against Lana I Holmes, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 28, 2005 |
CategoryComplaint |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time3391 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 34 DUE TO JUDICIAL REASSIGNMENT | |
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 36 DUE TO JUDICIAL REASSIGNMENT | |
February 18, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NTC TO COURT OF COMPROMISE OF ARREARS SERVED ON LANA I HOLMES FILED. DATE OF MAILING 02/18/10 | |
February 18, 2010 | Docket Event | DECLARATION NTC TO COURT OF COMPROMISE OF ARREARS FILED | |
February 20, 2009 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR LANA I HOLMES | |
January 20, 2009 | Docket Event | APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR LANA I HOLMES FILED BY COUNTY OF VENTURA | |
March 01, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO LANA I HOLMES | |
February 06, 2006 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED. | |
February 06, 2006 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ESTABLISHING PARENTAL RELATIONSHIP AND CHILD SUPPORT FILED | |
January 30, 2006 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF COUNTY OF VENTURA AS TO LANA I HOLMES. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.