Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Margueritte S. Kibel, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mathew Joseph Kibel, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 28, 2005 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions538 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time1550 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2010 | Docket Event | AMENDED STIPULATED QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER RE: TEAMSTERS-NATIONAL 401(K) SAVINGS PLAN FILED BY MARGUERITTE S. KIBEL | |
March 27, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD (CCP SECTION 285.1) FILED. FORMER ATTORNEY MARK A. NELSON REMOVED AS TO MARGUERITTE S. KIBEL AND REPLACED AS PRO/PER | |
December 10, 2008 | Docket Event | STIPULATED QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER RE: DIVISION OF TEAMSTERS PENSION BENEFITS FILED BY MARGUERITTE S. KIBEL | |
December 10, 2008 | Docket Event | STIPULATED QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER RE: FEDEX CORPORATION RETIREMENT SAVINGS PLAN FILED BY MARGUERITTE S. KIBEL | |
December 10, 2008 | Docket Event | STIPULATED QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER RE: TEAMSTERS- NATIONAL 401K SAVINGS PLAN FILED BY MARGUERITTE S. KIBEL | |
January 31, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND RESPONSE OF EMPLOYEE PENSION BENEFIT PLAN WESTERN CONFERENCE OF TEAMSTERS PENSION PLA FILED BY BENJAMIN F. SPATER | |
November 15, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND RESPONSE OF EMPLOYEE PENSION BENEFIT PLAN FEDEX CORPORATION RETIREMENT SAVINGS PLAN FILED BY PRO/PER | |
November 15, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE OF APPERANCE AND RESPONSE OF EMPLOYEE ETC. SERVED ON MARK NELSON, DARREN GOODMAN, MATHEW KIBEL (NON-PARTY) FILED. DATE OF MAILING: 11/13/07 | |
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR JOINDER OF EMPLOYEE PENSION BENEFIT PLAN TEAMSTERS-NATIONAL 401 (K) SAVINGS PLAN AND ORDER FILED; SUMMONS ISSUED | |
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR JOINDER OF EMPLOYEE PENSION BENEFIT PLAN FEDEX CORPORATION RETIREMENT SAVINGS PLAN AND ORDER FILED; SUMMONS ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.