Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Steven Fonteyne, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Linda Fonteyne, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Bruce A. Young presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBruce A. Young Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 29, 2005 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions142 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time142 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2005 | Docket Event | FURTHER CASE REVIEW CONFERENCE | |
October 18, 2005 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTERED AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
October 18, 2005 | Docket Event | MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 03/01/06 | |
October 18, 2005 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION (FAMILY CODE 2336) FILED | |
October 06, 2005 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED BY STEVEN FONTEYNE | |
October 06, 2005 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE, STIPULATION AND WAIVERS (RESPONSE ALREADY FILED) FILED BY STEVEN FONTEYNE | |
October 03, 2005 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY LINDA FONTEYNE | |
September 27, 2005 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY STEVEN FONTEYNE | |
September 26, 2005 | Docket Event | (FL) CASE REVIEW CONFERENCE | |
September 12, 2005 | Docket Event | RESPONSE (FAMILY LAW) FILED BY LINDA FONTEYNE REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.