Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Maribel Avila, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Luis Enrique Dzul, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2005 |
CategoryDv Req Orders |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time3541 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 34 DUE TO JUDICIAL REASSIGNMENT | |
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 36 DUE TO JUDICIAL REASSIGNMENT | |
June 24, 2005 | Docket Event | HEARING ON RESTRAINING ORDER REQUESTED BY MARIBEL AVILA | |
June 24, 2005 | Docket Event | MEDIATION SET IN VENTURA | |
June 01, 2005 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY MARIBEL AVILA | |
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE COURT ASSIGNMENT (DOMESTIC VIOLENCEE) FILED | |
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDER (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE) FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.