Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Solinas Village Apartments, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Dahl, Ronald W, against Smith, Judith, Smith, Jeb, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with L. Bryce Chase presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2005 |
Category32-Cl >10K <25K Unlawful Detainer - Residential-Civil Limit |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time2538 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2012 | Hearing | Case Destroyed Pursuant to Government Code Section | |
May 13, 2005 | Hearing |
NP1511 Department: AD Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:DISMISSAL THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY EITHER PARTY. CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO BOTH PARTIES. |
|
May 13, 2005 | Hearing |
4003 Order to Show Cause New Calendar |
|
May 13, 2005 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause No response to Order to Show Cause. TENTATIVE RULING: Dismiss without prejudice. No appearance required. Judge: Chase, L Bryce |
|
May 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause No response to Order to Show Cause. TENTATIVE RULING: Dismiss without prejudice. No appearance required. Judge: Chase, L Bryce |
|
May 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
4003 Order to Show Cause New Calendar |
|
May 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
NP1511 Department: AD Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:DISMISSAL THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY EITHER PARTY. CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO BOTH PARTIES. |
|
April 13, 2005 | Hearing |
Notice of Hearing ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL HEARING DATE: 5/13/2005 HEARING TIME: 10:00 AM DEPARTMENT: A |
|
April 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL HEARING DATE: 5/13/2005 HEARING TIME: 10:00 AM DEPARTMENT: A |
|
February 10, 2005 | Hearing |
Original Summons / Proof of Service WHAT SERVED: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION WHO SERVED: JEB SMITH HOW SERVED: PERSONAL SERVICE WHEN SERVED: 2/4/05 WHAT SERVED: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION WHO SERVED: JUDITH SMITH HOW SERVED: PERSONAL SERVICE WHEN SERVED: 2/4/05 WHAT SERVED: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION WHO SERVED: ALL OCCUPANTS HOW SERVED: SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON JUDITH SMITH, 40/WH/ WHEN SERVED: 2/4/05 AND BY MAIL ON 2/4/05 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.