Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lu, Michael, filed a(n) (32) Limited Residential Ud - Under 10,000 (Cvud) case against Woodbury, Ross, represented by Silber, David S, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2018 |
Category(32) Limited Residential Ud - Under 10,000 (Cvud) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time6 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Not Satisfied | |
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Order | |
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.