Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mynhier, Tracey, filed a(n) (32) Limited Residential Ud - Under 10,000 (Cvud) case against Soito, Ellisa, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 07, 2017 |
Category(32) Limited Residential Ud - Under 10,000 (Cvud) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time24 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Satisfied | |
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession | |
December 01, 2017 | Docket Event | UD 1161a: Crt Trial Held & Jdgmt Agnst all Def w/in 60 days | |
November 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
November 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
November 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event | At-Issue Memorandum | |
November 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Answer / Response / Denial - Limited up to $10,000 | |
November 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees | |
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.