Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Monfared, Shahriar S, filed a(n) (32) Limited Residential Ud - Under 10,000 (Cvud) case represented by Bordsen, Brant J, against Simmons, Georgette, Simmons, Tyler, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Julia L. Scrogin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 26, 2017 |
Category(32) Limited Residential Ud - Under 10,000 (Cvud) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time49 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event | UD 1161a: Crt Trial Held & Jdgmt Agnst all Def w/in 60 days | |
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Scrogin, Julia L |
|
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of UD Settlement Conference /Trial | |
November 27, 2017 | Docket Event | At-Issue Memorandum | |
November 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Answer Unlawful Detainer | |
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Order | |
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Application for Order for Publication or Posting | |
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.