Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jeffery T. Helm, Inc., filed a(n) (32) Limited Residential Ud - Under 10,000 (Cvud) case represented by Barrette, Michael R, against Meraz, Valerie Charlotte, Muma, Joe, Mchugh, Cynthia, Mchugh, Walter, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 20, 2017 |
Category(32) Limited Residential Ud - Under 10,000 (Cvud) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time61 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Satisfied | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | UD Judgment for Plaintiff | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Dismissal in Part | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
November 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
November 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of UD Settlement Conference /Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.