Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Fidela Crucero Aguinaldo, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Gary S Saunders, against Mcsweeny Farms Community Association, Merit Property Management, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts Superior with Angel M. Bermudez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedFebruary 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: January 18, 2024Minute Order: Case Management Conference
Date: January 24, 2024Certificate of Mailing
Date: January 11, 2024Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion OSC Set
Date: January 11, 2024Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2023-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)
Date: 2023-07-05T00:00:00Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)
Date: June 26, 2023Certificate of Counsel.
Date: 2023-06-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2023-12-27T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion CMC Continued
Date: 2023-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2023-07-05T00:00:00Returned Mail
Date: January 08, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2023-06-26T00:00:00Amended Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion OSC Set
Date: January 11, 2024For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.