Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Ace F. Lopez, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kevin Y. Jacobson, against Fca Us Llc, Fca Us Llc, A Delaware Limited Liability Company, represented by Brian Yasuzawa, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts Superior with Angel M. Bermudez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedFebruary 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint alleges violations of the Song-Beverly Act by FCA US LLC. The plaintiff, ACE F. LOPEZ, is claiming breach of both express and implied warranties. The specific violation of the Song-Beverly Act mentioned is Section 1793.2. The case is f...
Certificate of Mailing
Date: August 15, 2023Request for Dismissal
Date: January 26, 2024Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion TSC Set
Date: August 15, 2023Certificate of Counsel.
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Complaint Violation of Song-Beverly Act - Breach of Express Warranty
Date: February 16, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)
Date: 2023-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2023-02-28T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ACE F. LOPEZ
Date: 2023-03-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.