Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
John Barthel, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Paul Aaron Levine, against All Persons Unknown,Claiming Any Legal Or Equitable Right,Title,Estate,Lien Or Interest In The Property, Kathryn Webber, represented by Tyler Michael Vance, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts Superior with Raquel A. Marquez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Quiet Title |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by John Barthel against Kathryn Webber and unknown defendants. The complaint includes four causes of action: quiet title, fraud, declaratory relief, and partition. John Barthel alleges that he has an ownership interest in a pr...
Minute Order: Case Management Conference
Date: February 22, 2024Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: February 07, 2024Case Management Statement on 2nd Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of JOHN BARTHEL
Date: February 07, 2024Request for Dismissal on 2nd Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of JOHN BARTHEL
Date: February 15, 2024Answer to Complaint on 2nd Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of JOHN BARTHEL
Date: January 09, 2024Amended Summons Issued and Filed.
Date: November 22, 2023Minute Order: Hearing re: Demurrer on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of JOHN BARTHEL
Date: 2023-10-26T00:00:002nd Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of JOHN BARTHEL
Date: 2023-11-22T00:00:00Declaration of Tyler Vance in Support of Amended Demurrer
Date: 2023-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2023-09-21T00:00:00Motion to Strike Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of JOHN BARTHEL
Date: 2023-09-21T00:00:00Declaration of Tyler Vance in Support of Amended Motion to Strike
Date: 2023-09-29T00:00:00Summons on 1st Amended Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2023-05-10T00:00:00Declaration of Tyler Vance in Support of Motion to Strike
Date: 2023-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion Continues the 10/3/2023 Case Management Conference
Date: 2023-09-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of JOHN BARTHEL
Date: 2023-09-18T00:00:00Declaration of Tyler Vance in Support of Demurrer
Date: 2023-09-21T00:00:001st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of JOHN BARTHEL
Date: 2023-05-10T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re: Minute Order dated 5/15/2023
Date: 2023-05-15T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re: Minute Order dated 9/15/2023
Date: 2023-09-15T00:00:00Declaration of John F. Mansour ISO Motion to Strike
Date: 2023-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Responsive Pleading/ Request for Entry of Default
Date: 2023-09-15T00:00:00Demurrer on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of JOHN BARTHEL
Date: 2023-09-21T00:00:00Declaration of John F. Mansour ISO Demurrer
Date: 2023-02-15T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion Continues the 5/31/2023 Case Management Conference
Date: 2023-05-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Motion to Strike on Complaint for Quiet Title of JOHN BARTHEL
Date: 2023-02-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-11-09T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2022-11-09T00:00:00Motion to Strike Complaint on Complaint for Quiet Title of JOHN BARTHEL
Date: 2023-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Quiet Title
Date: 2022-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Pendency of Action on Complaint for Quiet Title of JOHN BARTHEL
Date: 2022-12-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Demurrer on Complaint for Quiet Title of JOHN BARTHEL
Date: 2023-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2022-12-01T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint for Quiet Title of JOHN BARTHEL
Date: 2022-12-28T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel.
Date: 2022-11-09T00:00:00Complaint for Quiet Title
Date: November 09, 2022Demurrer on Complaint for Quiet Title of JOHN BARTHEL
Date: 2023-02-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.