Case Last Refreshed: 4 days ago
Lynanne Marie Reed, Sydney Moore-Jehle, Shelvie Albrecht, W.E. Jon Albrecht, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Stanley Southwick, against Lynanne Marie Reed, Sydney Moore, Sydney Moore-Jehle, represented by In Pro Per, Lynanne Marie Reed, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts Superior with Angel M. Bermudez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by W. E. Jon Albrecht, doing business as Albrecht & Albrecht, a Professional Law Corp., against Sydney Moore, Marie Reed, and Does 1 through 5. The complaint alleges causes of action for quantum meruit, breach of contract, pro...
Request for Dismissal
Date: February 27, 2024Notice of Jury Trial
Date: January 09, 20241st Amended Cross-Complaint of SYDNEY MOORE-JEHLE
Date: December 22, 2023Proof of Service on Cross-Complaint of SYDNEY MOORE-JEHLE
Date: December 22, 2023Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: December 21, 2023Certificate of Mailing
Date: December 21, 2023Minute Order: Hearing re: Demurrer on Cross-Complaint of SYDNEY MOORE-JEHLE
Date: 2023-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling re: Demurrer on Cross-Complaint of SYDNEY MOORE-JEHLE
Date: 2023-12-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2023-12-06T00:00:00Declaration of Ryan Southwick in Support of Motion to Strike
Date: 2023-12-05T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Strike Portions of the Cross-Complaint on Cross-Complaint of SYDNEY MOORE-JEHLE
Date: 2023-11-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice.
Date: 2023-11-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Electronic Service (non-complaint) of Reply on Cross-Complaint of SYDNEY MOORE-JEHLE
Date: 2023-11-29T00:00:00Opposition to Demurrer on Cross-Complaint of SYDNEY MOORE-JEHLE
Date: 2023-11-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2023-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2023-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2023-10-11T00:00:00Demurrer on Cross-Complaint of SYDNEY MOORE-JEHLE
Date: 2023-10-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice.
Date: 2023-10-09T00:00:00Declaration of Stanley K. Southwick in Support of Demurrer and Motion to Stike
Date: 2023-10-09T00:00:00Declaration of Stanley K. Southwick In Support of Demurrer and Motion to Strike
Date: 2023-10-09T00:00:00Declaration of Lynanne Marie Reed ISO Opposition to Motion for Order
Date: 2023-10-06T00:00:00Motion to Strike Complaint on Cross-Complaint of SYDNEY MOORE-JEHLE
Date: 2023-10-09T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion Issues In Chamber Orders
Date: 2023-08-18T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re: Minute Order dated 8/18/2023
Date: 2023-08-18T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons on Cross-Complaint of SYDNEY MOORE-JEHLE
Date: 2023-08-10T00:00:00Proof of Service on Cross-Complaint of SYDNEY MOORE-JEHLE
Date: 2023-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-08-02T00:00:00Amended Cross-Civil Case Cover Sheet on Cross-Complaint of SYDNEY MOORE-JEHLE
Date: 2023-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-08-01T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2023-07-31T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2023-07-31T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2023-07-31T00:00:00Counter Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)
Date: 2023-07-31T00:00:00Answer to Complaint on Cross-Complaint of LYNANNE MARIE REED
Date: 2023-07-10T00:00:00Declaration of Lynanne M. Reed, Esq.
Date: 2023-07-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2023-06-27T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion TSC Continued and OSC Set
Date: 2023-06-27T00:00:00Minute Order: Status Hearing re: Complex Case Designation Pursuant to Local Rule 3160
Date: 2023-06-12T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-06-12T00:00:00Demurrer on 2nd Amended Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of W.E. JON ALBRECHT
Date: 2023-06-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice.
Date: 2023-06-09T00:00:00Declaration of Lynanne M Reed, Esq.
Date: 2023-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-06-08T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2023-06-08T00:00:00Counter Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)
Date: 2023-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-05-11T00:00:00Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion for Sanctions by LYNANNE MARIE REED
Date: 2023-04-26T00:00:00Reply Declaration ISO Motion
Date: 2023-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Errata
Date: 2023-04-14T00:00:00Declaration of LYNANNE MARIE REED
Date: 2023-04-03T00:00:00Demurrer on 2nd Amended Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of W.E. JON ALBRECHT
Date: 2023-02-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice.
Date: 2023-02-27T00:00:00Declaration of Lynanne M. Reed
Date: 2023-02-27T00:00:00Declaration of Lynanne Marie Reed
Date: 2023-02-24T00:00:00Declaration of Robert Moore ISO Motion to Quash
Date: 2023-02-14T00:00:00Declaration of Lynanne M. Reed ISO Motion to Quash
Date: 2023-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-02-10T00:00:002nd Amended Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of W.E. JON ALBRECHT
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order: Case Management Conference
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2022-12-01T00:00:00Demurrer on 1st Amended Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of W.E. JON ALBRECHT
Date: 2022-11-09T00:00:001st Amended Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of W.E. JON ALBRECHT
Date: 2022-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion CMC and OSC Continued
Date: 2022-10-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2022-10-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2022-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order: Case Management Conference
Date: 2022-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion CMC Continued and OSC set
Date: 2022-07-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2022-07-26T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of W.E. JON ALBRECHT
Date: 2022-10-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)
Date: February 08, 2022Certificate of Counsel.
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.