Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
County Of Riverside, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil Injunctive Relief case represented by Caroline K Monroy, against All Fabric Llc, A Minnesota Limited Liability Company, K. J. Vang, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Raquel A. Marquez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 28, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Injunctive Relief |
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
|
Complaint for Injunctive Relief
Date: February 02, 2022Request for Judicial Notice.
Date: November 07, 2022Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion for Preliminary Injunction by COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Declaration of Code Enforcement Officer Ryan Calametti in Support of Motion
Date: November 07, 2022Declaration of Code Enforcement Officer Louie Holloway in Support of Motion
Date: November 07, 2022Proposed Amended Judgment
Date: November 07, 2022Declaration of Melissa Walker in Support of Motion
Date: November 07, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment on Complaint for Injunctive Relief of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re: Minute Order dated 3/28/2022
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice.
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order: Case Management Conference
Date: August 09, 2022Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion Gives Zoom Notice for 4/13/2022 Hearing
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Declaration of Deputy County Counsel Caroline K. Monroy in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Order of Preliminary Injunction
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Motion to Enforce Stipulated Judgment on Complaint for Injunctive Relief of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE
Date: November 07, 2022Motion for Preliminary Injunction on Complaint for Injunctive Relief of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint for Injunctive Relief of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel.
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Declaration of Code Enforcement Officer Ryan Calametti in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Injunctive Relief
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.