Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kathleen Causey, Mhc Operating Limited Partnership, Mhc Royal Holiday, Llc, Option One Plumbing Inc., filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Allan Dollison, In Pro Per, Thomas Michael Mcgreal, against Best Boring And Bursting, Inc., Mhc Operating Limited Partnership, Mhc Royal Holiday, Llc, Option One Plumbing Inc., Royal Holiday Mobile Home Park, (total of 6) See All represented by John E. Bowerbank, Marlin Ellsworth Howes, Michelle P. Moy, Miguel Del Rosario, Yasmine Hussein, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Angel M. Bermudez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAngel M. Bermudez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort |
Last RefreshedFebruary 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Answer to Complaint on Cross-Complaint of OPTION ONE PLUMBING INC.
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00Proof of Service on Cross-Complaint of OPTION ONE PLUMBING INC.
Date: 2022-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2022-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel.
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order: Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Declaration of Thomas M. McGreal in Response to OSC re: Sanctions or Dismissal
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: January 26, 2023Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Continuance of Trial Setting Conference and OSC
Date: January 26, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Plaintiff's Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: January 26, 2023Declaration of Jose Carlos Gutierrez ISO Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2023-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Order to Show Cause For Failure to Appear
Date: January 26, 2023Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Table of Evidence ISO Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Declaration of Hugo A. Lopez ISO Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2023-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Notice re: Continued Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Non-Opposition to Sanctions
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Answer to Complaint on Cross-Complaint of MHC OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Declaration of John E. Bowerbank ISO Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2023-01-03T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion TSC continued and OSC Set
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00Proof of Service on Cross-Complaint of OPTION ONE PLUMBING INC.
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2022-11-02T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Proof of Service on Cross-Complaint of MHC OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Answer to Complaint on Cross-Complaint of MHC OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order: Case Management Conference
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Declaration of Thomas M. McGreal in Response to OSC Re: Sanctions or Dismissal
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Continued CMC
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel.
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.