Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
County Of Riverside, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Douglas Jay Evertz, against All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Interest Or Title In Or To The Property, Department Of Fish And Wildlife, State Of California, State Of California, Acting By And Through The Department Of Fish & Wildlife, represented by Kyle Da Silva, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts Superior with Eric A. Keen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 08, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation |
Last RefreshedFebruary 12, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This legal document is a complaint filed by the County of Riverside against the State of California, Department of Fish and Wildlife, and unknown individuals with an interest in certain properties. The County seeks to acquire these properties through...
COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN
Date: October 11, 2023Declaration of Summary Basis of Appraisal
Date: October 16, 2023Declaration of Resolution of Necessity
Date: October 16, 2023Notice of Pendency of Action
Date: October 16, 2023Notice of Deposit of Probable Compensation
Date: 2023-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: December 04, 2023Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion for Order for Prejudgment Possession
Date: December 21, 2023Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Order for Prejudgment Possession
Date: December 04, 2023Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2023-10-11T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2023-10-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2023-10-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000)
Date: 2023-10-11T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel.
Date: 2023-10-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.