Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
County Of Riverside, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Jennifer R. Mcclure, against All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Interest Or Title In Or To The Property, Arie Van Ryn And Loretta J. Van Ryn, Chicago Title Company, Michael A. Van Ryn And Dina M. Van Ryn, represented by Susan Marie Hutchison, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts Superior with Godofredo Magno presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 11, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Complaint in Eminent Domain
Date: September 11, 2023Notice of Withdrawal of Pending Motion for Order for Prejudgment Possession
Date: September 28, 2023Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion For Order for Prejudgment Possession by COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE
Date: November 20, 2023Notice of Document Return.
Date: September 28, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2023-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000)
Date: 2023-09-11T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel.
Date: 2023-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Pendency of Action
Date: 2023-09-13T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2023-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Deposit of Probable Compensation
Date: 2023-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2023-09-11T00:00:00Declaration re: Summary Basis of Appraisal
Date: 2023-09-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.