Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Matthew Mcdonald, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Shani O. Zakay, against Aps Singh Llc, Satvinder Sraon, Inc., represented by Sammy Zreik, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts Superior with Harold W. Hopp presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHarold W. Hopp Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Other Employment |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a class action complaint filed by Matthew McDonald against APS Singh LLC, Satvinder Sraon, Inc., and Does 1-50. The complaint alleges multiple violations, including unfair competition, failure to pay minimum wages, failure to pay ov...
Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing
Date: December 05, 2023Minute Order: Case Management Conference - Complex
Date: 2023-11-13T00:00:00Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of MATTHEW MCDONALD
Date: 2023-11-06T00:00:00Minute Order: Case Management Conference - Complex
Date: January 12, 2024Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2023-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: November 15, 2023Certificate of Mailing
Date: November 14, 2023Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2023-09-08T00:00:001st Amended Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of MATTHEW MCDONALD
Date: 2023-09-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000)
Date: 2023-07-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2023-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-09-15T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of MATTHEW MCDONALD
Date: 2023-08-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010)
Date: 2023-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-09-06T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel.
Date: 2023-07-07T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2023-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2023-07-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.