Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Angela Sivla, Chantelle Gayagas, Deborah Seymour, Diana Rodrigo, Fernando A. Silva, (total of 15) See All filed a(n) Construction - Torts case represented by Lori Joann Guthrie, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts Superior with Harold W. Hopp presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 03, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Construction Defect |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeConstruction |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Amendment to Order Staying Proc
Date: May 18, 2023Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Construction Defect of EDYTHE ABELL
Date: May 24, 2023Notice of Document Return.
Date: May 11, 2023Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees on Complaint for Construction Defect of EDYTHE ABELL
Date: 2023-04-14T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Construction Defect of EDYTHE ABELL
Date: 2023-04-19T00:00:00Construction Defect Case Management Order #1 on Complaint for Construction Defect of EDYTHE ABELL
Date: 2023-04-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010)
Date: 2023-03-21T00:00:00Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Construction Defect Case Management Order #1
Date: 2023-04-03T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint for Construction Defect of EDYTHE ABELL
Date: 2023-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2023-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2023-03-23T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel.
Date: 2023-03-21T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2023-03-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.