Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Antonia R Coloma, Benny Coloma, Marian Missionary Prayer Community Foundation, Ruelito V Polancos, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Daniel Forde, against Antonia R Coloma, Benny Coloma, represented by Rob Schelling, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts Superior with Eric A. Keen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 07, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Plaintiffs Ruelito V. Polancos and Marian Missionary Prayer Community Foundation against Defendants Benny Coloma, Antonia R. Coloma, and DOES 1-25. The complaint alleges several causes of action, including ...
Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)
Date: January 10, 2023Certificate of Mailing
Date: September 12, 2023Request for Dismissal as to Cross-Defendants Roes 1 though 10 ONLY (see attachment 1b(6))
Date: September 12, 2023Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: September 12, 2023Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: July 07, 2023Certificate of Mailing
Date: November 07, 2023Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: November 07, 2023Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2023-07-07T00:00:00Summons on Cross-Complaint of Benny Coloma and Antonia R Coloma
Date: 2023-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2023-01-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2023-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel.
Date: 2023-01-10T00:00:00Plaintiffs and Cross-Defendants' Verified Answer on Cross-Complaint of ANTONIA R COLOMA
Date: 2023-03-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.