Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Miriam Soledad Jauregui, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil Fraud case represented by Carlo C Ignacio, Evan L. Ginsburg, In Pro Per, against Home Expo Financial, Inc., Parkgreen Homeowners Association, Parkside Green Homeowners Association, represented by Edward M. Palmer, Laura Anne Reiland, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts Superior with Eric A. Keen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Fraud |
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Document Return.
Date: April 03, 2024Notice of Document Return.
Date: February 27, 2024Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2024-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2024-02-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2024-02-08T00:00:00Order of Dismissal
Date: 2024-02-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement on 2nd Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of MIRIAM SOLEDAD JAUREGUI
Date: 2024-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2024-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2024-01-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement on 2nd Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of MIRIAM SOLEDAD JAUREGUI
Date: 2024-01-29T00:00:00Returned Mail
Date: 2023-12-26T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-12-12T00:00:00Returned Mail
Date: 2023-12-15T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-12-11T00:00:00Amended Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2023-12-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2023-12-05T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2023-12-05T00:00:00Returned Mail
Date: 2023-10-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement on 2nd Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of MIRIAM SOLEDAD JAUREGUI
Date: 2023-11-21T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2023-09-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2023-09-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement on 2nd Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of MIRIAM SOLEDAD JAUREGUI
Date: 2023-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2023-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2023-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-07-26T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (MC-053)
Date: 2023-07-18T00:00:00Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for MIRIAM SOLEDAD JAUREGUI
Date: 2023-07-18T00:00:00Tentative Rulings for July 18, 2023
Date: 2023-07-18T00:00:00Proof of Service - Civil on 1st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of MIRIAM SOLEDAD JAUREGUI
Date: 2023-07-03T00:00:002nd Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of MIRIAM SOLEDAD JAUREGUI
Date: 2023-07-17T00:00:00Proof of Service-Civil on 1st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of MIRIAM SOLEDAD JAUREGUI
Date: 2023-07-03T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-06-27T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order: Case Management Conference
Date: 2023-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-06-15T00:00:00[Proposed] Order on 1st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of MIRIAM SOLEDAD JAUREGUI
Date: 2023-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2023-06-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2023-06-13T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2023-06-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement on 1st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of MIRIAM SOLEDAD JAUREGUI
Date: 2023-05-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement on 1st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of MIRIAM SOLEDAD JAUREGUI
Date: 2023-05-25T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2023-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-05-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement on 1st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of MIRIAM SOLEDAD JAUREGUI
Date: 2023-05-18T00:00:00Notice OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: 2023-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order: Ex Parte Hearing re: for an Order to Stay Lock Out and Enforcement of Judgment
Date: 2023-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order: Ex Parte Application for an Order to Stay Lock Out and Enforcement of Judgment
Date: 2023-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-03-22T00:00:00[Proposed] Order on 1st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of MIRIAM SOLEDAD JAUREGUI
Date: 2023-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion Motion to Consolidate Related Actions by MIRIAM SOLEDAD JAUREGUI
Date: 2023-02-27T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-02-23T00:00:00Tentative Rulings for February 27, 2023
Date: 2023-02-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2023-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2023-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000)
Date: 2022-12-16T00:00:00Amended Summons Issued and Filed.
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of MIRIAM SOLEDAD JAUREGUI
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:001st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of MIRIAM SOLEDAD JAUREGUI
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2022-12-16T00:00:00Proof of Service Summons on 1st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of MIRIAM SOLEDAD JAUREGUI
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2022-12-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel.
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Complaint for Fraud
Date: December 15, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.