Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
City Of Calimesa, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Regina N. Danner, against Any And All Persons Unknown Having Or Claiming To Have Any Title Or Interest In Or To The Property Sought To Be Condemned Herein, Estate Of Troyce Lee Gayle, South Mesa Water Company, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts Superior with Godofredo Magno presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 09, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Complaint in Eminent Domain
Date: November 15, 2022Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: April 11, 2023Declaration of of Bryan G. Riggs, MAI, SR/WA in Support of Deposit of Probable Compensation
Date: January 23, 2023Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)
Date: November 17, 2022Notice of Department Assignment
Date: November 17, 2022Notice of Deposit
Date: January 23, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel.
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.