Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
Orange County Flood Control District, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Kristen S. Steinke, against All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Title Or Interest In Or To The Property Described Herein, Evelyn Norris, Jmj Financial Group, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Phh Mortgage Corporation, (total of 7) See All represented by Jarlath M. Curran, Esq, John L Jackson Iv, Karyn A.M. Jakubowski, Kristen S. Steinke, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts Superior with Carol A. Greene presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation |
Last RefreshedApril 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Document Return.
Date: March 18, 2024Certificate of Mailing
Date: March 26, 2024Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: March 26, 2024Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(c))
Date: December 29, 2023Notice of Document Return.
Date: December 28, 2023Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: November 22, 2023Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-10-31T00:00:00Trial Setting Order
Date: 2023-10-05T00:00:00Demand for Appraisal Exchange
Date: 2023-10-03T00:00:00Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2023-10-03T00:00:00Minute Order: Case Management Conference
Date: 2023-08-03T00:00:00Notice OF CONTINUED TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Date: 2023-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2023-05-31T00:00:00Minute Order: Case Management Conference
Date: 2023-06-15T00:00:00Minute Order: Case Management Conference
Date: 2023-03-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2023-03-06T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2023-03-06T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2023-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order: Ex Parte Hearing re: for Prejudgment Possession by ORANGE COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:00Order of Prejudgment Possession
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:00Declaration RE: Resolution of Necessity
Date: 2022-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Deposit
Date: 2022-11-10T00:00:00Plaintiff Orange County Flood Control District's Peremptory Challenge Pursuant to CCP 170.6
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Complaint for Eminent Domain
Date: September 06, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment to Department
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000)
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel.
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.