Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Antelope Valley Nissan, Inc., Robert Serengulian, Zovik Serengulian, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lauren Ungs, against Antelope Valley Nissan, Inc., Nissan North America, Inc., represented by Judd Gilefsky, Ryan Marden, Shahram Nassi, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts Superior with Chad W. Firetag presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Request for Dismissal
Date: December 05, 2023Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Jury Trial
Date: June 07, 2023Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ROBERT SERENGULIAN
Date: 2022-04-05T00:00:00Amendment to Trial Setting Order
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Trial Setting Order
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Amended Notice of Hearing (Civil)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ROBERT SERENGULIAN
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Complaint 1. Violation of Song-Beverly Act - Breach of Express Warranty
Date: March 29, 2022Request for Dismissal on Cross-Complaint of ANTELOPE VALLEY NISSAN, INC.
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Cross-Complaint for: 1. Indemnity; 2. Contribution; 3. Apportionment; and 4. Declaratory Relief
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel.
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.