Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Julio Marroquin, Rosaemilia Ortiz, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kevin Y. Jacobson, against American Honda Motor Co., Inc., represented by Trang T Tran, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts Superior with Chad W. Firetag presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 24, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedNovember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Complaint 1. Violation of Song-Beverly Act - Breach of Express Warranty
Date: February 22, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: August 17, 2023Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Stipulation to Continue Trial and Trial-Related Dates
Date: April 26, 2023Stipulation to Continue Trial and Trial-Related Dates; Order
Date: April 26, 2023Notice of Document Return.
Date: April 18, 2023Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00Trial Setting Order
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of JULIO MARROQUIN
Date: 2022-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of JULIO MARROQUIN
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Amended Notice of Hearing (Civil)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Stipulation and Protective Order
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Amendment to Trial Setting Order
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel.
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of JULIO MARROQUIN
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.