Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Orange County Flood Control District, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Alan A Sozio, against All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Title Or Interest In Or To The Property Described Herein, Barbara E. Mccune, Carrie Alta Swanson, Chicago Title Company, Mccune Realty Investment Co., L.P., (total of 7) See All represented by Douglas J Dennington, Jordan Trachtenberg, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts Superior with Daniel A. Ottolia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Complaint in Eminent Domain
Date: January 14, 2022Notice of Deposit
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00DECLARATION RE: RESOLUTION OF NECESSITY
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: July 24, 2023Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-06-27T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-06-26T00:00:00Trial Setting Order
Date: 2023-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Application of Defendants Mccune Realty Investments Co L.P ET AL for Withdrawal of Deposit
Date: 2023-06-26T00:00:00Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2023-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2022-11-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2022-11-02T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Amended Notice of Hearing (Civil)
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel.
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Notice OF CONTINUED TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Date: 2023-04-24T00:00:00Notice OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL
Date: 2023-06-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2023-04-17T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2023-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-02-22T00:00:00Order of Prejudgment Possession
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.