Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Fernando Romano Orrego, Virginia Serena Hermenegildo, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Amy Morse, against General Motors Llc, Oremor Of Riverside Rc Llc, represented by Marlene Kristen Flores, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Daniel A. Ottolia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Certificate of Mailing
Date: December 09, 2021Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing
Date: December 09, 2021Certificate of Mailing
Date: December 03, 2021Amended Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: December 03, 2021Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: December 03, 2021Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: November 16, 2021Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order: Hearing re: Status Conference
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service
Date: 2021-03-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: May 11, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel.
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: May 11, 2021Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.