Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Thomas, Fred Lee, filed a(n) (43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) (Petition Of) (Cvpt case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts Superior with Julia L. Scrogin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 06, 2023 |
Category(43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) (Petition Of) (Cvpt |
Last RefreshedAugust 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Petition to Terminate Sex Offender Registration
Judge: Scrogin, Julia L |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Petition to Terminate Sex Offender Registration
Judge: Scrogin, Julia L |
|
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition - No Fee | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | SB384 Eligibility Determination Rec. From Law Enf. Agency | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Petition to Terminate Sex Offender Registration
Judge: Scrogin, Julia L |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | SB384 Petition NOT County of Conviction/Adjudication |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.